Financial history GWEEK SEALS UNDER 5'S

Charity number: 1032128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.75k £3.11k £3.78k £5.17k £7.56k
Total expenditure £3.49k £4.82k £3.83k £4.97k £6.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A