Financial history CRANBROOK AND HAWKHURST ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1032191
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £10.02k £8.37k £16.39k £12.33k £2.38k
Total expenditure £11.77k £7.33k £13.30k £10.90k £10.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A