Accounts and annual returns KNIGHTS CIRCLE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SPIRITUAL AWARENESS AND HEALING

Charity number: 1032596
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 01 February 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 February 2017 26 January 2018 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2016 10 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2016 Not Required