Accounts and annual returns RAMSEY MANOR LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required