Accounts and annual returns MERRYHILLS PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window