Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF EASTLEIGH

Charity Number: 1033751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 05 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 30 August 2009 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required