Accounts and annual returns NEW BROUGHTON AND CAEGO WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1034817
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 20 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 10 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 28 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required