Trustees TANSOR PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1035283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Katherine Ticehurst Chair 09 November 2022
None on record
Dean Thomas Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Rachael Pinion Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Jennifer Bierton Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Katherine Troughton Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Harriet Rose Morgan Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Rachael Ann Baragwanath Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Wendy Jane Whitmee Trustee 09 November 2022
None on record
Sophia May Williams Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Wendy Sue Ross Trustee 06 June 2018
None on record
RUTH MEASURES Trustee 21 August 2011
None on record