Financial history SIXTY PLUS

Charity number: 1035607
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £283.90k £299.17k £299.12k £379.38k £361.61k
Total expenditure £297.69k £280.48k £326.94k £370.56k £369.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A