Accounts and annual returns WINFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1035998
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 23 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2006 07 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 19 May 2006 On Time