Financial history WINFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1035998
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2004 28/02/2005 28/02/2006 28/02/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £371.16k £440.69k £334.51k £357.68k £348.54k
Total expenditure £294.70k £362.37k £384.35k £434.56k £395.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A