Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SPRINGFIELD (PTA)

Charity Number: 1036040
Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Annual return 09 September 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2021 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2020 07 September 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 09 September 2019 21 July 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 September 2019 Not Required