Accounts and annual returns MOUNT STREET INFANTS AND NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036632
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required