Financial history MOUNT STREET INFANTS AND NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036632
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.91k £589 £1.25k £868 £1.18k
Total expenditure £4.30k £3.45k £879 £3.02k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A