Accounts and annual returns TOTTENHAM GREEN COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity number: 1037628
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 November 2020 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 November 2020 140 days late
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 25 March 2019 On Time