Accounts and annual returns EMPLOYERS NETWORK ON DISABILITY FOR MILTON KEYNES
Charity number: 1038025
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 15 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 March 2009 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 15 December 2008 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 02 March 2009 | 396 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 03 March 2009 | 762 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 02 March 2009 | 761 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 12 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 30 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 30 June 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window