Financial history FRIENDS OF NORTH CURRY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039906
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £8.98k £10.39k £2.58k £1.78k £5.36k
Total expenditure £12.99k £13.39k £6.59k £1.80k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A