Accounts and annual returns THE MILLHAVEN TRUST

Charity number: 1040588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 July 2008 24 August 2009 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2008 24 August 2009 115 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 12 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time