Financial history THE MILLHAVEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1040588
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 01/07/2008
Total gross income £78.24k £90.69k £88.24k £87.32k £111.07k
Total expenditure £88.52k £79.82k £83.15k £85.63k £151.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A