Financial history OLD WINDSOR PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1040764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.42k £68.39k £50.79k £48.36k £31.41k
Total expenditure £58.75k £46.07k £49.21k £50.24k £54.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.34k £64.96k £46.07k £40.75k £24.88k