Accounts and annual returns M.H.I.S.T. - MENTAL HEALTH INDEPENDENT SUPPORT TEAM

Charity number: 1041505
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 26 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 09 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 11 March 2008 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 21 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time