Financial history M.H.I.S.T. - MENTAL HEALTH INDEPENDENT SUPPORT TEAM

Charity number: 1041505
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £208.40k £226.65k £151.10k £156.03k £148.18k
Total expenditure £232.74k £232.93k £140.88k £133.24k £129.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A