Accounts and annual returns ST GEORGE'S WINCHESTER TRUST

Charity number: 1042045
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 30 August 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 08 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 30 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 02 April 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 04 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 08 September 2008 On Time