Financial history ST GEORGE'S WINCHESTER TRUST

Charity number: 1042045
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £17.96k £16.30k £27.34k £18.07k £4.26k
Total expenditure £235 £276 £8.25k £4.58k £2.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A