Accounts and annual returns FAIRHAM COMMUNITY COLLEGE FUND

Charity number: 1042980
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 20 May 2008 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 25 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required