Accounts and annual returns PLUCKLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1043385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 25 February 2025 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 February 2025 636 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 February 2025 1001 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 March 2022 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 March 2022 666 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required