Financial history PLUCKLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1043385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £768 £516 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.27k £420 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A