Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044110
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 10 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 07 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required