Financial history SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044110
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £10.92k £4.14k £6.77k £7.17k £2.92k
Total expenditure £9.43k £3.52k £7.40k £7.29k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A