Accounts and annual returns FULLERS HILL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1044367
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2011 03 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 03 April 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 03 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 03 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 04 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required