Financial history FULLERS HILL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1044367
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011
Total gross income £20.30k £22.60k £24.73k £28.66k £27.57k
Total expenditure £22.61k £22.49k £24.65k £28.65k £27.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A