Financial history THE CROCKHAM HILL VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1044489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.82k £24.58k £40.77k £45.48k £46.57k
Total expenditure £40.93k £37.31k £43.89k £61.72k £60.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £4.71k N/A N/A