Trustees THE CROCKHAM HILL VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1044489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Stockdale Chair 30 May 2023
None on record
Jeremy Pearson Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Karen Stafford Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Emily Keeley Trustee 08 November 2022
CROCKHAM HILL SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Judy Newton Trustee 26 November 2015
None on record
June Rosalind Davies Trustee 03 June 2015
None on record
Neil Marshall Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
DEBORAH JAYNE COEN Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record