Financial history MAYFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1044859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/09/2019 05/09/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £104.13k £136.00k £110.68k £131.45k £137.64k
Total expenditure £106.88k £98.61k £127.86k £129.50k £133.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A