Accounts and annual returns MARSTON THOROLD'S CHARITY C E (A) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044920
Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required