Trustees MARSTON THOROLD'S CHARITY C E (A) SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1044920

Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Leong | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
GORDON RICHARD CANNON | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR ROSS | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Sutherland | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kiala Burton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Waddelle | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steph Kirton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Schaanning | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Barker | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stuart Hadley | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.