Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT DORSET
Charity number: 1045300
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 16 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 April 2008 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 17 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 March 2007 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 04 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 14 October 2004 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window