Accounts and annual returns THE PLYMOUTH CHAMBER MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1045357
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 04 June 2010 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 29 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2008 10 June 2009 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 10 June 2009 41 days late
Annual return 30 June 2007 11 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 11 February 2008 On Time