Financial history THE PLYMOUTH CHAMBER MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1045357
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £20.39k £20.81k £21.62k £20.10k £20.10k
Total expenditure £22.57k £23.81k £23.64k £18.98k £18.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A