Financial history BEES AND TREES LIMITED

Charity number: 1045505
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.03k £6.06k £7.37k £1.69k £0
Total expenditure £10.04k £5.04k £10.32k £5.32k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A