Accounts and annual returns EDENFIELD C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1046423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2024 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 October 2020 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required