Financial history EDENFIELD C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1046423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £10.20k £5.58k £856 £2.28k £629
Total expenditure £7.04k £12.99k £6.23k £502 £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A