Accounts and annual returns PARKSIDE COMMUNITY ALL WEATHER PITCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1046918
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 27 February 2014 02 April 2015 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2013 29 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2012 Not Required