Financial history FIRST STEPS PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1047843
Charity reporting is overdue by 1793 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £2.48k £1.63k £1.34k £1.81k £1.49k
Total expenditure £2.41k £1.55k £1.54k £1.46k £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A