Accounts and annual returns THE BEECH HOUSE ULTRA SOUND SCANNER AND AMENITY FUND
Charity Number: 1048809
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 20 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 14 May 2010 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 07 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 07 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 08 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 15 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 11 May 2006 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window