Financial history BENGEO PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1049421
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009
Total gross income £32.03k £29.78k £29.13k £28.06k £44.21k
Total expenditure £30.89k £28.44k £29.10k £27.06k £33.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A