Accounts and annual returns NORTHALLERTON SCHOOL & SIXTH FORM COLLEGE FUND

Charity Number: 1049635
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2017 On Time