Financial history NORTHALLERTON SCHOOL & SIXTH FORM COLLEGE FUND

Charity Number: 1049635
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £72.25k £113.99k £135.37k £69.83k £96.01k
Total expenditure £67.18k £103.11k £145.54k £74.74k £86.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A