Financial history SWANSEA NHS TRUST ENDOWMENT FUNDS

Charity Number: 1050866
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.90m £1.83m £2.37m £2.47m £1.64m
Total expenditure £1.68m £1.54m £2.32m £3.75m £2.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £2.10m £1.45m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £233.00k £190.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £135.00k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £986.00k £352.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £3.70m £2.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £2.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £26.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0