Financial history POTTERS CROSS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1051336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £77.26k £84.07k £80.70k £73.59k £105.88k
Total expenditure £78.42k £82.96k £72.91k £81.57k £112.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.33k N/A N/A